TN HB0471 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, sets awards from net lottery proceeds for certain postsecondary scholarships and grants at the amount the student initially received or at the amount awarded for initial recipients in the current semester of enrollment, whichever is greater. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51, Part 1 and Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, sets awards from net lottery proceeds for certain postsecondary scholarships and grants at the amount the student initially received or at the amount awarded for initial recipients in the current semester of enrollment, whichever is greater. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51, Part 1 and Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Education | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1867 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-20 - Failed In S. Ed. Comm. Ayes 4, Nays 5 PNV 0