TN HB0466 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes TDOT to employ analysts and economists in addition to other employees to perform duties related to railroad regulation. - Amends TCA Title 65, Chapter 3, Part 2 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, authorizes TDOT to employ analysts and economists in addition to other employees to perform duties related to railroad regulation. - Amends TCA Title 65, Chapter 3, Part 2 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0644 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0466&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0466.pdf |