TN HB0465 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the department of environment and conservation to June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, extends the department of environment and conservation to June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 368 | |
2019-04-30 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0134 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 368