TN HB0460 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Empowerment Scholarship Account Act." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Empowerment Scholarship Account Act." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] |
Rep. Gerald McCormick [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/21/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0395 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee