TN HB0457 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions governing the money teachers receive for classroom instruction materials. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises provisions governing the money teachers receive for classroom instruction materials. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 389
2017-05-04HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-04HouseComp. SB subst.
2017-05-03HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-03HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017
2017-05-02HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017
2017-04-25HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-04-20HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-19HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/25/2017
2017-04-19HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-04-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017
2017-04-12HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-04-11HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-11HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2017
2017-04-04HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 4/4/2017
2017-03-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017
2017-03-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/28/2017
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
2017-02-09HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2017-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-06HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0401 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 389

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback