TN HB0457 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts "Dustin's Law." - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, enacts "Dustin's Law." - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0454 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0457&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0457.pdf |