TN HB0457 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 169
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates Class A misdemeanor of producing, manufacturing, selling or offering to sell any product containing any of six listed synthetic derivatives or analogues of the Schedule I controlled substance methcathinone. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates Class A misdemeanor of producing, manufacturing, selling or offering to sell any product containing any of six listed synthetic derivatives or analogues of the Schedule I controlled substance methcathinone. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH & HUMAN RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HHR SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health & Human Resources Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HHR SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: HHR Subcommittee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-10 Pub. Ch. 169
2011-05-10 Effective date(s) 05/05/11
2011-05-05 Signed by Governor.
2011-04-25 Transmitted to Governor for his action.
2011-04-25 Signed by S. Speaker
2011-04-20 Signed by H. Speaker
2011-04-19 Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2011-04-18 Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
2011-04-18 S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
2011-04-18 Rcvd. from H., P1C.
2011-04-18 Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2011-04-18 Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0
2011-04-18 H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0136)
2011-04-13 H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2011
2011-04-12 Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2011
2011-03-30 Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2011-03-23 Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 3/30/2011
2011-03-22 Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee
2011-03-16 Placed on s/c cal HHR Subcommittee for 3/22/2011
2011-03-15 Action Def. in s/c HHR Subcommittee to 3/22/2011
2011-03-09 Placed on s/c cal HHR Subcommittee for 3/15/2011
2011-02-10 Assigned to s/c HHR Subcommittee
2011-02-10 P2C, ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee
2011-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-08 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0396 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 169

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback