TN HB0457 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes the Silver Alert system within the TBI to provide statewide information distribution regarding missing person suffering from dementia or other cognitive impairment. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, establishes the Silver Alert system within the TBI to provide statewide information distribution regarding missing person suffering from dementia or other cognitive impairment. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Judiciary Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary--Government Operations for review | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1441 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-22 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0457&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0457.pdf |