TN HB0456 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the Tennessee state veterans' homes board to June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 58, Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends the Tennessee state veterans' homes board to June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 58, Chapter 7.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019
2019-03-04HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/4/2019
2019-02-25HouseMeeting Canceled
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/25/2019
2019-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-01HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0124 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-25 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback