TN HB0456 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a homeowners' association from adopting or enforcing a dedicatory instrument provision that prohibits, or has the effect of prohibiting, a property owner from displaying the flag of the United States of America or an official or replica flag of any branch of the United States armed forces on the property owner's property; allows certain restrictions regarding display. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 66.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a homeowners' association from adopting or enforcing a dedicatory instrument provision that prohibits, or has the effect of prohibiting, a property owner from displaying the flag of the United States of America or an official or replica flag of any branch of the United States armed forces on the property owner's property; allows certain restrictions regarding display. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 66.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 331 | |
2017-05-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-01 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0469 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 331