TN HB0455 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to psychology.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Jason Hodges [D] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Mark Hall [R] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Vincent Dixie [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 352 | |
2021-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0161 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021