TN HB0449 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Failed in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes a governmental entity to publish notices of public meetings on a secure website of the governmental body; authorizes a person to request an electronic or hard copy of an e-newsletter or notice published by the governmental body if the governmental body provides such documents electronically. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 44, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 44, Part 1, relative to public meetings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-22 - House - HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Failed in State Government Committee (Y: 7 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22HouseFailed in State Government Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/22/2023
2023-03-14HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/14/2023
2023-03-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/14/2023
2023-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/7/2023
2023-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
2023-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2023-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-25HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0550 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback