TN HB0446 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department of revenue to report to the fiscal review committee and transportation committees on the actual or estimated number of passenger motor vehicles that have been issued stickers or decals to use the HOV lane. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-188.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the department of revenue to report to the fiscal review committee and transportation committees on the actual or estimated number of passenger motor vehicles that have been issued stickers or decals to use the HOV lane. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-188.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018
2018-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-18HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-18HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18
2018-04-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018
2018-03-21HousePlaced behind the budget
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-03-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-13HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-12HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-07HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/13/2018
2018-03-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-06HouseAction def. in Transportation Committee to 3/13/2018
2018-02-28HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/6/2018
2018-02-27HouseAction def. in Transportation Committee to 3/6/2018
2018-02-21HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/27/2018
2017-03-28HouseFailed in Transportation Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/28/2017
2017-03-21HouseAction def. in Transportation Committee to 3/28/2017
2017-03-15HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/21/2017
2017-03-15HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2017-03-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2017-02-09HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2017-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-06HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0444 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-19 - Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback