TN HB0446 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits either the sponsor of the proposed charter school or the local board of education to appeal to chancery court a final decision of the state board of education on the charter school's application. - Amends TCA Section 49-13-108.
Title
As introduced, permits either the sponsor of the proposed charter school or the local board of education to appeal to chancery court a final decision of the state board of education on the charter school's application. - Amends TCA Section 49-13-108.
Sponsors
Rep. John Forgety [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1018 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-21 - Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/27/2013
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0446&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0446.pdf |