TN HB0446 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the application fee for a restricted license, after having a driver license suspended based on a failure by a driver to submit to tests determining blood alcohol content, from $20.00 to $50.00; increases the fine for both the offense and the delinquent act of underage driving while impaired from $250 to $500. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, increases the application fee for a restricted license, after having a driver license suspended based on a failure by a driver to submit to tests determining blood alcohol content, from $20.00 to $50.00; increases the fine for both the offense and the delinquent act of underage driving while impaired from $250 to $500. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 55.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/21/2012 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0297 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-29 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0446&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0446.pdf |