TN HB0443 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the University of Tennessee College of Medicine and the East Tennessee State University Quillen College of Medicine, in cooperation with the department of health and THEC, to administer certain residency opportunities; creates a resident training program to provide resident training opportunities for physicians focusing on family medicine and general internal medicine to provide medical and behavioral health services in medically underserved areas and rural counties, distributed across all three grand divisions of this state. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 33; Title 49; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7; Title 33; Title 49; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to medical education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 587 | |
2021-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0298 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021