TN HB0440 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Def. to Summer Study in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Def. to Summer Study in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, imposes a $5.00 fee on certain money transmitter transactions that transmit money from a location originating in this state to a location outside of the United States or its territories. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 45, Chapter 7 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 45, Chapter 7 and Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to money transmission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Commerce Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-23 | House | Action def. in Commerce Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass, if am. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0356 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Deferred to Summer Study