TN HB0430 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Placed behind the budget
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Placed behind the budget
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a juvenile court to impose a blended sentence on a child 16 years of age or older for a juvenile offense that would be a Class A, B, or C felony if committed by an adult; defines blended sentencing as a combination of any disposition otherwise provided for juveniles and a period of adult probation to be served after the child turns 18 years of age and which ends on or before the child's twenty-fifth birthday. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to acts committed by juveniles.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. John Gillespie [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] |
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-01-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 1/23/2024 |
2024-01-16 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2024-01-10 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 1/16/2024 |
2023-04-11 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to First Calendar of 2024 |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/11/2023 |
2023-04-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0624 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-17 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.