TN HB0429 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a voter to take photographs or videos of only the voter’s marked ballot on a mobile electronic or communication device in polling place; authorizes poll watchers and election officials to prohibit any disruptive activity that threatens the voting process or the privacy of a voter. - Amends TCA Section 2-7-142.
Title
As introduced, allows a voter to take photographs or videos of only the voter’s marked ballot on a mobile electronic or communication device in polling place; authorizes poll watchers and election officials to prohibit any disruptive activity that threatens the voting process or the privacy of a voter. - Amends TCA Section 2-7-142.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1296 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee