TN HB0420 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, appropriates funds for 2008-2009 fiscal year.
Title
As enacted, appropriates funds for 2008-2009 fiscal year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 5 | |
2009-03-02 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-02-26 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/2/09 | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 02/26/2009 | |
2009-02-24 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 02/24/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-02-12 | Sponsor change. | |
2009-02-12 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 02/18/2009 | |
2009-02-12 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to Finance | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0317 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-31 - Pub. Ch. 5
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0420&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0420.pdf |