TN HB0419 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes man who has paid child support for a child who is not his biological child to recover such child support from the biological father. - Amends TCA Section 36-2-309.
Title
As introduced, authorizes man who has paid child support for a child who is not his biological child to recover such child support from the biological father. - Amends TCA Section 36-2-309.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Withdrawn. | |
2011-03-15 | Failed for Lack of Second in: C&FA Subcommittee | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on s/c cal C&FA Subcommittee for 3/15/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Action Def. in s/c General Sub of C&FA to 3/15/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on s/c cal General Sub of C&FA for 3/1/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of C&FA | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0122 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-02 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0419&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0419.pdf |