TN HB0416 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits a trustee or former trustee of a board of trustees of a hospital authority from entering into an arrangement for employment or the provision of labor or services with the authority until at least 12 months have expired following the trustee or former trustee's tenure of service on the board. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits a trustee or former trustee of a board of trustees of a hospital authority from entering into an arrangement for employment or the provision of labor or services with the authority until at least 12 months have expired following the trustee or former trustee's tenure of service on the board. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-11HouseAction def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/18/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-09HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-05HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0179 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-04 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback