TN HB0409 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, confers criminal and civil immunity upon a person who uses or threatens force in self-defense, defense of another, or defense from a person committing a criminal offense, unless the person against whom force is used is a law enforcement officer during discharge of the officer's duties and the person knows the person is an officer. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 11, Part 6 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, confers criminal and civil immunity upon a person who uses or threatens force in self-defense, defense of another, or defense from a person committing a criminal offense, unless the person against whom force is used is a law enforcement officer during discharge of the officer's duties and the person knows the person is an officer. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 11, Part 6 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Judiciary
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseAction def. in Judiciary to 4/10/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-02-27HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1275 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback