TN HB0409 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that the curriculum required before an employee is permitted to carry a handgun on the property of schools in distressed rural counties may be adapted by the instructing law enforcement agency from an existing curriculum approved by POST. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-816.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that the curriculum required before an employee is permitted to carry a handgun on the property of schools in distressed rural counties may be adapted by the instructing law enforcement agency from an existing curriculum approved by POST. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-816.
Sponsors
Rep. David Byrd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 278 | |
2017-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee-- Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1151 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 278