TN HB0407 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/25/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/25/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, limits the fish and wildlife commission's authority to regulate only certain paddlecraft rental operations; revises the reporting requirement for paddlecraft rental operations; designates records provided to TWRA by a paddlecraft rental outfitter confidential and not to be open for inspection by members of the public. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 11; Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 11; Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70, relative to nonmotorized vessels.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/25/2023 | |
2023-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 235 | |
2023-04-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-04 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0141) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-21 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-20 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-03-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0155) |
2023-03-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0639 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 235