TN HB0405 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from October 1 to October 15, the date by which a child care program licensed by the department of education must submit its annual report to the department. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0518 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee