TN HB0405 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 421
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 421
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires LEAs and public charter schools to adopt a trauma-informed discipline policy; requires the department of education to develop guidance on trauma-informed discipline practices that LEAs must use to develop a trauma-informed discipline policy. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires LEAs and public charter schools to adopt a trauma-informed discipline policy; requires the department of education to develop guidance on trauma-informed discipline practices that LEAs must use to develop a trauma-informed discipline policy. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] | Sen. London Lamar [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Mike Stewart [D] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 421 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2019 | |
2019-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 1, PNV 2 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0378) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 80, Nays 11, PNV 6 |
2019-04-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0404) |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Action def. in Education to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Meeting Adjourned |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0170 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 421