TN HB0403 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds former members of the general assembly who filed notice with the office of vital records while serving in the general assembly to the list of persons authorized to solemnize marriages. - Amends TCA Section 36-3-301.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 36-3-301, relative to marriage solemnization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 119 | |
2021-03-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0309 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2021