TN HB0402 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each local board of education to adopt a policy requiring all K-12 teachers, principals, and assistant principals employed by the LEA to participate in adverse childhood experiences (ACEs) training on an annual basis. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires each local board of education to adopt a policy requiring all K-12 teachers, principals, and assistant principals employed by the LEA to participate in adverse childhood experiences (ACEs) training on an annual basis. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0064 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee