TN HB0394 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits state employees from lobbying for 12 months following departure from office or employment. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, prohibits state employees from lobbying for 12 months following departure from office or employment. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] |
Rep. Tilman Goins [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. David Alexander [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Rep. Timothy Wirgau [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2017-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2017-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0815 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee