TN HB0387 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Def. to Summer Study in Employee Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Def. to Summer Study in Employee Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes it a discriminatory practice for a person who is paying a non-employee for labor or services to engage in harassment of the non-employee because of the non-employee's sex; holds such persons liable for the actions of their employees in engaging in such harassment under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, makes it a discriminatory practice for a person who is paying a non-employee for labor or services to engage in harassment of the non-employee because of the non-employee's sex; holds such persons liable for the actions of their employees in engaging in such harassment under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 50.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0380 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-26 - Deferred to Summer Study