TN HB0384 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends compensation for death of emergency responders to emergency medical technicians and paramedics; authorizes local governments to continue to provide health insurance to the surviving spouse and children of an emergency medical technician or paramedic killed in the line of duty. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2 and Title 8, Chapter 27.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends compensation for death of emergency responders to emergency medical technicians and paramedics; authorizes local governments to continue to provide health insurance to the surviving spouse and children of an emergency medical technician or paramedic killed in the line of duty. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2 and Title 8, Chapter 27.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 776
2020-06-18HouseComp. SB subst.
2020-06-17HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/18/2020
2020-06-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/16/2020
2020-06-16HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-16HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/16/2020
2020-06-16HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-06-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
2020-03-11HousePlaced behind the budget
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
2019-04-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-27HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-02-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Local Committee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-19HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0029 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 776

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback