TN HB0383 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes an LEA to use the ACT, ACT Aspire, or SAT suites of assessments, instead of state-mandated assessments, to test students in grades 9-12 in the subjects of math and English language arts. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, authorizes an LEA to use the ACT, ACT Aspire, or SAT suites of assessments, instead of state-mandated assessments, to test students in grades 9-12 in the subjects of math and English language arts. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0488 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee