TN HB0383 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces the fee for expunction to $205, reduces the time after which sentences have been completed before a person can apply for expunction to one year, and allows a person to obtain expunction for an assault conviction. - Amends TCA Section 40-32-101.
Title
As introduced, reduces the fee for expunction to $205, reduces the time after which sentences have been completed before a person can apply for expunction to one year, and allows a person to obtain expunction for an assault conviction. - Amends TCA Section 40-32-101.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0253) |
2017-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0115) |
2017-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1254 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee