TN HB0380 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits solitary confinement for juveniles in a juvenile detention facility. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Title
As introduced, prohibits solitary confinement for juveniles in a juvenile detention facility. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0326 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-08 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee