TN HB0379 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 533
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires TSAC to promulgate rules designating pregnancy as an approved medical leave of absence for purposes of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires TSAC to promulgate rules designating pregnancy as an approved medical leave of absence for purposes of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 533
2020-03-02HouseComp. SB subst.
2020-02-27HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/2/2020
2020-02-26HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2020
2020-02-24HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-02-19HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/24/2020
2020-02-12HouseRec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee
2020-02-06HousePlaced on cal. Education for 2/12/2020
2020-02-04HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education
2020-01-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/4/2020
2019-02-26HouseDef. to Summer Study in Higher Education Subcommittee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Education-- Government Operations for Review
2019-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0823 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 533

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback