TN HB0378 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases from 30 to 60, the amount of days within which an individual may request a hearing pursuant to the Uniform Administrative Procedures Act following the denial of an individual's application for an employee permit provided by the alcoholic beverage commission, when the individual fails to meet certain requirements but is otherwise eligible for a permit. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcoholic beverages.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-01HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0415 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-26 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback