TN HB0378 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Assigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Assigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the requirement that the governor receive authorization by the general assembly prior to making any decision or obligating the state with regard to the expansion of optional enrollment in the medical assistance program. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
As introduced, removes the requirement that the governor receive authorization by the general assembly prior to making any decision or obligating the state with regard to the expansion of optional enrollment in the medical assistance program. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0378 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee