TN HB0376 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 234
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, limits any action to recover damages against a real estate appraiser arising out of the appraiser's real estate appraisal activity to being brought within one year from a person's discovery of the act or omission giving rise to the action; limits any disciplinary action against a real estate appraisal by the Board of Real Estate Appraisers from three years from the date the appraisal was completed. - Amends TCA Title 28 and Title 62, Chapter 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, limits any action to recover damages against a real estate appraiser arising out of the appraiser's real estate appraisal activity to being brought within one year from a person's discovery of the act or omission giving rise to the action; limits any disciplinary action against a real estate appraisal by the Board of Real Estate Appraisers from three years from the date the appraisal was completed. - Amends TCA Title 28 and Title 62, Chapter 39.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11 Pub. Ch. 234
2017-05-11 Effective date(s) 07/01/2017
2017-04-28 Signed by Governor.
2017-04-20HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2017-04-19SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-04-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-04-18HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2017-04-17SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2017-04-17SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2017-03-16SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2017-03-14HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2017-03-13HousePassed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2017-03-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-09HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/13/2017
2017-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/9/2017
2017-03-07HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-03-01HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/7/2017
2017-03-01HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2017-02-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2017
2017-02-22HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/1/2017
2017-02-21HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/22/2017
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2017-02-02HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-01HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0279 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 234

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback