TN HB0375 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that state and local taxes and fees be excluded from the calculation of interchange fees by payment card networks for electronic payment transactions. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to taxes and fees collected by merchants and sellers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-16HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2022-03-09HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/16/2022
2022-03-09HouseDef. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
2022-03-09HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
2022-03-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2022-03-02HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/9/2022
2022-03-02HouseAction Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 3/9/2022
2022-02-23HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/2/2022
2021-03-31HouseAction Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to First Calendar of March 2022
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
2021-03-11HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
2021-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
2021-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-21HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0880 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback