TN HB0375 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the Tennessee Duck River development agency to set a per thousand-gallon fee to charge participating entities for water withdrawals; makes other changes to the operation of the agency. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 1, Part 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 64, Chapter 1, Part 6, relative to the Tennessee Duck River development agency.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/21/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-02-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 2/7/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 1/30/2024 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1397 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Signed by H. Speaker