TN HB0374 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, in jurisdictions that conduct citizen police academies or similar programs, that members of a community oversight board complete the local police force's citizen academy course or program; establishes timeframe for completion and provides that noncompliant member will lose voting privileges until requirement is met. - Amends TCA Title 38.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, relative to law enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Michael Curcio [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Kirk Haston [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Rule 39(3) Amend# 2 by Bell (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Rule 39(3) Amend# 2 by Bell (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 523 | |
2021-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-05 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA2 Ayes 68, Nays 22 PNV 0 HB0374 |
2021-05-04 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar #2 for 5/4/21 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 6 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment #2 SA0446 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0391) |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 72, Nays 21, PNV 0 |
2021-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0037) |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0457 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 523