TN HB0372 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases standard for the promulgation of rules by the board of water quality, oil and gas to force a volumetric or surface poolwide unit for the production of oil or gas, by requiring that "at least 75 percent," instead of "more than 50 percent," of pool producers owning the subject pool acreage request unitization of the pool. - Amends TCA Title 60, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, increases standard for the promulgation of rules by the board of water quality, oil and gas to force a volumetric or surface poolwide unit for the production of oil or gas, by requiring that "at least 75 percent," instead of "more than 50 percent," of pool producers owning the subject pool acreage request unitization of the pool. - Amends TCA Title 60, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0660 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0372&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0372.pdf |