TN HB0370 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Failed in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits government payments, fees, and other forms of financial benefits paid or bestowed, or agreed to be paid or bestowed, to a private entity from being deemed confidential under the open records provisions of state law unless the transaction or proposed transaction falls under a specific state or federal law. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits government payments, fees, and other forms of financial benefits paid or bestowed, or agreed to be paid or bestowed, to a private entity from being deemed confidential under the open records provisions of state law unless the transaction or proposed transaction falls under a specific state or federal law. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseFailed in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-03-06HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1292 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback