TN HB0369 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Failed to pass Senate, Ayes 11, Nays 11
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Failed to pass Senate, Ayes 11, Nays 11
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes owners of real property to construct certain residential buildings on that property without obtaining a contractor license; requires notice of construction to be made to the board for licensing contractors and the register of deeds. - Amends TCA Title 13; Title 62, Chapter 6 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 13; Title 62, Chapter 6 and Title 66, relative to contracting performed by unlicensed persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 11 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Failed to pass Senate, Ayes 11, Nays 11 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0279) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-30 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/21 |
2021-03-18 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2021-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/21 |
2021-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-15 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2021-03-11 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0275 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.