TN HB0366 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises certain provisions regarding a litigation financier. - Amends TCA Section 47-16-105 and Section 47-16-109.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises certain provisions regarding a litigation financier. - Amends TCA Section 47-16-105 and Section 47-16-109.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 212
2017-04-17HouseComp. SB subst.
2017-04-13HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2017
2017-04-12HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017
2017-04-05HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-29HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-22HouseAction Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-15HouseMeeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/22/17
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
2017-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2017-02-02HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-01HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0305 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 212

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback