TN HB0365 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the county election commission to appoint the minimum number of election officials by at least 20 days before each election instead of 10 days before the election. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 5 and Title 8.
Title
As introduced, requires the county election commission to appoint the minimum number of election officials by at least 20 days before each election instead of 10 days before the election. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 5 and Title 8.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0389 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee