TN HB0364 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Def. to Summer Study in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that Schedule II opioids, Schedule II stimulants, and Schedule IV benzodiazepines be dispensed in a lockable vial; provides exceptions where it is not practicable to dispense the controlled substance in a lockable vial or there is a request from the user not to do so. - Amends TCA Title 53 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires that Schedule II opioids, Schedule II stimulants, and Schedule IV benzodiazepines be dispensed in a lockable vial; provides exceptions where it is not practicable to dispense the controlled substance in a lockable vial or there is a request from the user not to do so. - Amends TCA Title 53 and Title 63.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseDef. to Summer Study in Health Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseReassigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee
2019-02-27HouseReturned to Clerk's Desk
2019-02-27HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee of Health Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-20HouseAction Def. in s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee to 2/27/2019
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2019-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0475 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Deferred to Summer Study

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback