TN HB0361 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits officers of governmental animal control agencies to enter abandoned property and dwellings to rescue any non-livestock animal contained therein. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14 and Title 44.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 14 and Title 44, relative to abandoned animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-15 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0197) |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0310 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee