TN HB0359 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes when an agency's rule is exempt from the public hearing requirement; authorizes a person to file suit directly with chancery court to enjoin enforcement of a rule when the rule is not adopted in compliance with this act. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 5, relative to administrative procedure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/8/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0587 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee